Bursa Malaysia Berhad has appointed Devanesan Evanson as its new Chief Regulatory Officer
(CRO) effective today. Evanson replaces Md Nor Ahmad who retires today after twenty three years
with the exchange.
Evanson will be responsible for administering regulatory requirements for the Bursa Malaysia
Group. As CRO, he is required to monitor and enforce regulations for issuers and participants
within the Exchanges’, clearing houses and depository to ensure compliance with relevant listing,
trading, clearing and depository rules and regulations.
Evanson joined the exchange initially as an Internal Auditor in 1992. Prior to his promotion
to CRO, Evanson served as Deputy CRO since September 2005.
In addition, Bursa Malaysia has also made the following changes to its senior management team
in the past several months:
Chua Kong Khai was promoted from Head, Depository to Head, Information Services
Business Unit (ISBU) effective 1 March 2006. As Head of ISBU, Chua is responsible for
providing a wide range of information services and resources for both internal and external
stakeholders. Chua began his career at the exchange within the Malaysian Central Depository in
1993.
Zaini Long joined the exchange on 5 June 2006 as Head, Group Business Development (GBD). She
is responsible for the business development, marketing and promotion of the Bursa Malaysia group of
companies. Prior to the exchange, Zaini spent 27 years in marketing roles in several fast-moving
consumer goods companies.
Husin Jamal Hasnar was promoted to Head, Group Human Resources and Administration (GHRA)
effective 1 July 2006. Jamal’s primary responsibility is the development and implementation of
human resource strategy, office administration policies, security and business transformation of
the Bursa Malaysia Group.
Bursa Malaysia Berhad also announced that its Chief Financial Officer, Khairussalleh Ramli
has tendered his resignation. The exchange will announce his successor as soon as the candidate is
identified.
FTSE Mondo Visione Exchanges Index:
Bursa Malaysia Appoints New Chief Regulatory Officer
Date 01/08/2006